MI HB5419 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-09 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-09 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; athletic trainers; license fee and continuing education hours for athletic trainers; modify, and require training on use of automated external defibrillator. Amends secs. 16336, 17901, 17905 & 17906 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.16336 et seq.).
Title
Occupations; athletic trainers; license fee and continuing education hours for athletic trainers; modify, and require training on use of automated external defibrillator. Amends secs. 16336, 17901, 17905 & 17906 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.16336 et seq.).
Sponsors
Rep. Andrea LaFontaine [R] | Rep. Klint Kesto [R] | Rep. Cindy Denby [R] | Rep. Frank Foster [R] |
Rep. Scott Dianda [D] | Rep. John Kivela [D] | Sen. Ed McBroom [R] | Rep. Ken Yonker [R] |
Rep. Tim Kelly [R] | Rep. John Walsh [R] | Rep. Harold Haugh [D] | Rep. Marilyn Lane [D] |
Rep. Bruce Rendon [R] | Rep. Andy Schor [D] | Sen. Wayne Schmidt [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 497 (Y: 91 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 497 (Y: 91 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-12-09 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-12-09 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-09-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2014-09-24 | House | Transmitted |
2014-09-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 497 Yeas 91 Nays 17 |
2014-09-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-09-23 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-09-23 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2014-09-23 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-09-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-09-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2014-03-25 | House | Printed Bill Filed 03/21/2014 |
2014-03-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2014-03-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-03-20 | House | Introduced By Representative Andrea Lafontaine |
Subjects
Health, occupations
Occupations, athletic trainers
Occupations, individual licensing and regulation
State agencies (existing), licensing and regulatory affairs
Occupations, athletic trainers
Occupations, individual licensing and regulation
State agencies (existing), licensing and regulatory affairs