MI HB5422 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 526'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 526'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Corrections; employees; new employee training for corrections officers; allow to be provided by certain colleges under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 12 of 1982 PA 415 (MCL 791.512) & adds sec. 15a.
Title
Corrections; employees; new employee training for corrections officers; allow to be provided by certain colleges under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 12 of 1982 PA 415 (MCL 791.512) & adds sec. 15a.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Cotter [R] | Rep. Ray Franz [R] | Rep. Ken Goike [R] | Rep. Joe Haveman [R] |
Rep. Kurt Heise [R] | Rep. Bradford Jacobsen [R] | Sen. Peter MacGregor [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 875 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 967 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 363 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 967 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 363 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 526'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2012 @ 5:04 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/27/2012 @ 5:28 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/27/2012 @ 11:30 Am 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-14 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-14 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-14 | House | Roll Call # 875 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2012-12-14 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-12-13 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-12-13 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 967 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-12-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-12-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-12-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-06-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2012-06-06 | House | Transmitted |
2012-06-06 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 363 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2012-06-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-06-05 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-06-05 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-05-30 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-05-30 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-02-22 | House | Printed Bill Filed 02/22/2012 |
2012-02-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2012-02-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-02-21 | House | Introduced By Representative Joe Haveman |