MI HB5444 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 530'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 530'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Children; foster care; educational fund for foster children who are adopted or age out of foster care; establish. Amends title & secs. 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6 & 10 of 2008 PA 525 (MCL 722.1021 et seq.); adds sec. 7a & repeals secs. 7 & 8 of 2008 PA 525 (MCL 722.1027 & 722.1028).
Title
Children; foster care; educational fund for foster children who are adopted or age out of foster care; establish. Amends title & secs. 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6 & 10 of 2008 PA 525 (MCL 722.1021 et seq.); adds sec. 7a & repeals secs. 7 & 8 of 2008 PA 525 (MCL 722.1027 & 722.1028).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 839 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 503 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 503 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 530'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/14/2015 @ 3:53 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 1/10/2015 @ 4:12 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Presented To The Governor 1/5/2015 @ 4:06 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-17 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-17 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-12-17 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 839 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-09-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2014-09-24 | House | Transmitted |
2014-09-24 | House | Title Amended |
2014-09-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 503 Yeas 108 Nays 1 |
2014-09-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-09-23 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-09-23 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted And Amended |
2014-09-23 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-09-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-09-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2014-04-23 | House | Printed Bill Filed 04/18/2014 |
2014-04-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2014-04-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-04-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Peter Macgregor |
Subjects
Children, foster care
Higher education, financial aid
Higher education, students
State financing and management, funds
Higher education, financial aid
Higher education, students
State financing and management, funds