MI HB5444 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 31-2)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/09/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/09/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Education; curriculum; implementation of certain curriculum standards and assessments in place of common core curriculum standards and assessments in this state; require. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding secs. 1278e & 1278f.
Title
Education; curriculum; implementation of certain curriculum standards and assessments in place of common core curriculum standards and assessments in this state; require. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding secs. 1278e & 1278f.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/09/2016 |
2016-03-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2016-03-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-03-09 | House | Introduced By Representative Gary Glenn |
Same As/Similar To
SB0826 (Same As) 2016-04-27 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2016-HB-5444 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2015-2016/billintroduced/House/htm/2016-HIB-5444.htm |