MI SB0826 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Education; curriculum; implementation of certain curriculum standards and assessments in place of common core curriculum standards and assessments in this state; require. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding secs. 1278e & 1278f.
Title
Education; curriculum; implementation of certain curriculum standards and assessments in place of common core curriculum standards and assessments in this state; require. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding secs. 1278e & 1278f.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Colbeck [R] | Sen. Rick Jones [R] | Sen. Kenneth Horn [R] | Sen. Tonya Schuitmaker [R] |
Sen. Michael Shirkey [R] | Rep. Dale Zorn [R] | Sen. Michael Kowall [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Patrick Colbeck |
Same As/Similar To
HB5444 (Same As) 2016-03-10 - Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/09/2016