MI HB5667 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-08 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-08 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health; pharmaceuticals; allowable grams of ephedrine or pseudoephedrine for purchase; modify. Amends sec. 17766c of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17766c).
Title
Health; pharmaceuticals; allowable grams of ephedrine or pseudoephedrine for purchase; modify. Amends sec. 17766c of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17766c).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-07 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 592 (Y: 102 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2016-12-07 | House | Transmitted |
2016-12-07 | House | Passed Roll Call # 592 Yeas 102 Nays 5 |
2016-12-07 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-12-07 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-12-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-12-07 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2016-12-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-09-20 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-09-20 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2016-05-24 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/19/2016 |
2016-05-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2016-05-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-05-19 | House | Introduced By Representative John Kivela |