MI HB5720 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-06 - Postponed Temporarily
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-06 - Postponed Temporarily
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; renaissance zones; extension of certain existing renaissance zones; provide for. Amends sec. 4 of 1996 PA 376 (MCL 125.2684).
Title
Economic development; renaissance zones; extension of certain existing renaissance zones; provide for. Amends sec. 4 of 1996 PA 376 (MCL 125.2684).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-06 | House | Postponed Temporarily |
2012-12-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-06 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-06 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-06 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-12-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-06-05 | House | Printed Bill Filed 06/04/2012 |
2012-06-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce |
2012-06-01 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-06-01 | House | Introduced By Representative Ken Horn |