MI HB5790 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-13 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-13 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Law enforcement; peace officers; definition of peace officer in the carrying and administering opioid antagonists act; expand to include corrections officers. Amends sec. 1 of 2014 PA 462 (MCL 28.541).
Title
Law enforcement; peace officers; definition of peace officer in the carrying and administering opioid antagonists act; expand to include corrections officers. Amends sec. 1 of 2014 PA 462 (MCL 28.541).
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Howell [R] | Rep. Andy Schor [D] | Rep. Tom Cochran [D] | Rep. Jon Hoadley [D] |
Sen. John Bizon [R] | Rep. Earl Poleski [R] | Sen. Peter Lucido [R] | Rep. Henry Vaupel [R] |
Rep. John Chirkun [D] | Rep. Joel Johnson [R] | Sen. Samir Singh [D] | Rep. Edward Canfield [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-12-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 485 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 485 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2016-09-22 | House | Transmitted |
2016-09-22 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 485 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2016-09-22 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-09-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-09-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-09-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-09-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2016-09-07 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 08/03/2016 |
2016-08-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2016-08-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-08-03 | House | Introduced By Representative Gary Howell |
Subjects
Controlled substances: narcotic drugs
Corrections: employees
Health: pharmaceuticals
Law enforcement: peace officers
Law enforcement: training
Corrections: employees
Health: pharmaceuticals
Law enforcement: peace officers
Law enforcement: training