MI HB5883 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 471'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 471'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources; fishing; netting of fish; allow department of natural resources to issue order. Amends sec. 48703 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.48703).
Title
Natural resources; fishing; netting of fish; allow department of natural resources to issue order. Amends sec. 48703 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.48703).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 975 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 677 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 677 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 471'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/27/2012 @ 3:42 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/22/2012 @ 11:46 Am 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-27 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/20/2012 @ 3:06 Pm |
2012-12-13 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-13 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 975 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Outdoor Recreation And Tourism |
2012-12-05 | House | Transmitted |
2012-12-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 677 Yeas 106 Nays 0 |
2012-12-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-11-29 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-11-29 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-11-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-11-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-09-13 | House | Printed Bill Filed 09/12/2012 |
2012-09-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Tourism, And Outdoor Recreation |
2012-09-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-09-12 | House | Introduced By Representative Joel Johnson |