MI HB5975 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-10 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-10 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Children: child care; adult-to-child ratio for in-home child care providers; modify. Amends sec. 1 of 1973 PA 116 (MCL 722.111) & adds sec. 4b.
Title
Children: child care; adult-to-child ratio for in-home child care providers; modify. Amends sec. 1 of 1973 PA 116 (MCL 722.111) & adds sec. 4b.
Sponsors
Rep. Jack O'Malley [R] | Rep. Kathy Crawford [R] | Rep. Gregory Markkanen [R] | Rep. Douglas Wozniak [R] |
Rep. Pauline Wendzel [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 503 (Y: 59 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 503 (Y: 59 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors, And Veterans |
2020-12-01 | House | Transmitted |
2020-12-01 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 503 Yeas 59 Nays 44 Excused 0 Not Voting 7 |
2020-12-01 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-11-05 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-11-05 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2020-11-05 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-11-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-11-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-09-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-07-23 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 07/22/2020 |
2020-07-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2020-07-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-07-22 | House | Introduced By Representative Jack O'malley |