MI HB6030 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Assigned Pa 236'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Torts: defenses; COVID-19 emergency; provide protection from liability to certain persons. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 6032'20, HB 6101'20, HB 6031'20

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Torts: defenses; COVID-19 emergency; provide protection from liability to certain persons. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 6032'20, HB 6101'20, HB 6031'20

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-14 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 487 (Y: 86 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 403 (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 401 (Y: 57 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-28HouseAssigned Pa 236'20 With Immediate Effect
2020-10-28HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 10/22/2020 12:20 Pm
2020-10-28HouseApproved By The Governor 10/22/2020 11:34 Am
2020-10-14HousePresented To The Governor 10/16/2020 01:52 Pm
2020-10-14HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2020-10-14HouseRoll Call Roll Call # 487 Yeas 86 Nays 15 Excused 0 Not Voting 8
2020-10-14HouseRule Suspended
2020-10-14HouseSenate Substitute (s-2) Concurred In
2020-10-14HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2020-10-14HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute (s-2) With Immediate Effect
2020-10-14SenateTitle Amended
2020-10-14SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 403 Yeas 23 Nays 14 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2020-10-14SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-10-14SenateRules Suspended
2020-10-14SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2)
2020-10-14SenateSubstitute (s-2) Concurred In
2020-10-14SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
2020-10-13SenatePlaced On Order Of General Orders
2020-10-13SenateDischarge Committee Approved
2020-09-24SenateReferred To Committee On Economic And Small Business Development
2020-09-23HouseTransmitted
2020-09-23HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 401 Yeas 57 Nays 49 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
2020-09-23HouseRead A Third Time
2020-09-22HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-09-22HouseSubstitute (h-4) Adopted
2020-09-22HouseRead A Second Time
2020-09-16HouseReferred To Second Reading
2020-09-16HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-4)
2020-08-06HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 07/23/2020
2020-07-23HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2020-07-23HouseRead A First Time
2020-07-23HouseIntroduced By Representative Thomas Albert

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2020-HB-6030
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2020-HIB-6030.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2020-HEBH-6030.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2020-HEBS-6030.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/House/htm/2020-HNB-6030.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2020-PA-0236.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-09-16-073.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-09-23-075.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-10-14-081.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-10-14-084.htm

Bill Comments

feedback