MI HB6485 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Vetoed By The Governor 12/28/2018 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Vetoed By The Governor 12/28/2018 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax; deductions; elimination of income and expenses of producing oil and gas; clarify. Amends secs. 30, 36 & 623 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.30 et seq.).
Title
Individual income tax; deductions; elimination of income and expenses of producing oil and gas; clarify. Amends secs. 30, 36 & 623 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.30 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-21 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 1034 (Y: 56 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-21 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 1034 (Y: 56 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 1009 (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 723 (Y: 58 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-21 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 1034 (Y: 56 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 1009 (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 723 (Y: 58 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | House | Vetoed By The Governor 12/28/2018 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/27/2018 @ 3:52 Pm |
2018-12-21 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-21 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-21 | House | Roll Call # 1034 Yeas 56 Nays 49 |
2018-12-21 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-12-21 | House | Rule Suspended |
2018-12-21 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-21 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-21 | House | Roll Call # 1034 Yeas 56 Nays 49 |
2018-12-21 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-12-21 | House | Rule Suspended |
2018-12-21 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-12-21 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 1009 Yeas 27 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Adopted |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-12-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2018-12-06 | House | Transmitted |
2018-12-06 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 723 Yeas 58 Nays 51 |
2018-12-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-05 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-05 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-11-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-11-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-11-27 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/08/2018 |
2018-11-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Trade |
2018-11-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-11-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Triston Cole |
Subjects
Corporate income tax: deductions
Individual income tax: deductions
Individual income tax: income
Natural resources: gas and oil
Taxation: severance
Individual income tax: deductions
Individual income tax: income
Natural resources: gas and oil
Taxation: severance