MI HB6547 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-11-10 - Printed Bill Filed 11/10/2010
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-11-10 - Printed Bill Filed 11/10/2010
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax; millage; millage levy authorized for a zoological authority; increase. Amends sec. 13 of 2008 PA 49 (MCL 123.1173).
Title
Property tax; millage; millage levy authorized for a zoological authority; increase. Amends sec. 13 of 2008 PA 49 (MCL 123.1173).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-10 | Printed Bill Filed 11/10/2010 | |
2010-11-09 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations | |
2010-11-09 | Read A First Time | |
2010-11-09 | Introduced By Representative George Cushingberry |
Same As/Similar To
SB1579 (Same As) 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0328'10 With Immediate Effect
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2010-HB-6547 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2009-2010/billintroduced/House/htm/2010-HIB-6547.htm |