MI HJREEE | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-10 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-10 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Legislature; legislators; term limits; revise to combination of 14 years' total legislative service and require certain budget bills to be presented and signed by a certain date. Amends secs. 31 & 54, art. IV & adds sec. 55 to art. IV of the state constitution.
Title
Legislature; legislators; term limits; revise to combination of 14 years' total legislative service and require certain budget bills to be presented and signed by a certain date. Amends secs. 31 & 54, art. IV & adds sec. 55 to art. IV of the state constitution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-11-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-10 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-11-10 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 | |
2010-05-05 | Printed Joint Resolution Filed 05/05/2010 | |
2010-05-04 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | |
2010-05-04 | Read A First Time | |
2010-05-04 | Introduced By Representative Richard Leblanc |
Subjects
Constitutional amendments, state
Legislature, legislators
State agencies (existing), executive office
State financing and management, budget
Legislature, legislators
State agencies (existing), executive office
State financing and management, budget