MI SB0039 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-30 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-30 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Torts; governmental immunity; liability of a peace officer for injuries caused while rendering assistance outside jurisdiction; provide immunity. Amends sec. 7 of 1964 PA 170 (MCL 691.1407).
Title
Torts; governmental immunity; liability of a peace officer for injuries caused while rendering assistance outside jurisdiction; provide immunity. Amends sec. 7 of 1964 PA 170 (MCL 691.1407).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-30 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-11-30 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2010-11-10 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | |
2010-11-10 | Read A First Time | |
2010-11-10 | Received On 11/10/2010 | |
2010-11-10 | Passed Roll Call # 543 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-11-09 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-11-09 | Substitute S-1 Concurred In | |
2010-11-09 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-11-09 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-11-09 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-11-09 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-01-27 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |