MI SB0040 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Assigned Pa 0458'18
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Assigned Pa 0458'18
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; Michigan strategic fund; definition of "qualified new job"; expand to include out-of-state resident employed by a company located in a county that borders another state or country. Amends sec. 88r of 1984 PA 270 (MCL 125.2088r).
Title
Economic development; Michigan strategic fund; definition of "qualified new job"; expand to include out-of-state resident employed by a company located in a county that borders another state or country. Amends sec. 88r of 1984 PA 270 (MCL 125.2088r).
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Zorn [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 1011 (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 905 (Y: 56 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 24 (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 905 (Y: 56 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 24 (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0458'18 |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/27/2018 @ 3:46 Pm |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/26/2018 @ 8:31 Pm |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/26/2018 @ 2:52 Pm |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Roll Call # 1011 Yeas 24 Nays 14 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-20 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-12-20 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 905 Yeas 56 Nays 53 |
2018-12-20 | House | Amended |
2018-12-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-12-13 | House | Postponed Temporarily |
2017-12-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-12-13 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2017-12-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-12-13 | House | Substitute H-4 Adopted |
2017-12-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-12-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-12-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Trade |
2017-02-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-02-09 | House | Received On 02/09/2017 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 24 Yeas 24 Nays 13 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And International Investment |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Dale Zorn |