MI SB0082 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0308'20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0308'20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor: licenses; issuance of specially designated merchant license, a class C license, and a specially designated distributor license at the same time; allow. Amends sec. 533 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1533).
Title
Liquor: licenses; issuance of specially designated merchant license, a class C license, and a specially designated distributor license at the same time; allow. Amends sec. 533 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1533).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 582 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 387 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 387 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0308'20 |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/29/2020 02:28 Pm |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/29/2020 10:40 Am |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/21/2020 04:12 Pm |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-12-17 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-12-17 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2020-12-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 582 Yeas 107 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2020-12-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-12-17 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-17 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-12-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-12-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-12-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-12-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2020-10-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2020-10-01 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-10-01 | House | Received On 10/01/2020 |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 387 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Peter Lucido |