MI SB0144 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Assigned Pa 0022'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Assigned Pa 0022'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State financing and management; funds; Michigan strategic fund 21st century investments; clarify certain definitions. Amends sec. 88a of 1984 PA 270 (MCL 125.2088a).
Title
State financing and management; funds; Michigan strategic fund 21st century investments; clarify certain definitions. Amends sec. 88a of 1984 PA 270 (MCL 125.2088a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 50 (Y: 104 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 26 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 26 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0022'11 With Immediate Effect |
2011-04-28 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 4/27/2011 @ 1:07 Pm |
2011-04-28 | Senate | Approved By Governor 4/26/2011 @ 3:14 Pm |
2011-04-26 | Senate | Presented To Governor 4/18/2011 @ 11:16 Am |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2011-04-12 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2011-03-23 | House | Returned To Senate |
2011-03-23 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2011-03-23 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 50 Yeas 104 Nays 5 |
2011-03-23 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-03-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-03-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-03-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-03-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2011-03-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce |
2011-03-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-03-02 | House | Received On 03/02/2011 |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 26 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2011-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |