MI SB0269 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0504'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0504'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
State financing and management; funds; 21st century jobs trust fund; modify. Amends secs. 7 & 8 of 2000 PA 489 (MCL 12.257 & 12.258).
Title
State financing and management; funds; 21st century jobs trust fund; modify. Amends secs. 7 & 8 of 2000 PA 489 (MCL 12.257 & 12.258).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 924 (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 719 (Y: 82 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 717 (Y: 83 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 478 (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 719 (Y: 82 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 717 (Y: 83 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 478 (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0504'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/14/2015 @ 11:45 Am |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/10/2015 @ 2:18 Pm |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 1/2/2015 @ 11:00 Am 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Roll Call # 924 Yeas 31 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-19 | Senate | House Substitute H-3 Concurred In |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Postponed Temporarily |
2014-12-18 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-12-18 | House | Passed Roll Call # 719 Yeas 82 Nays 26 |
2014-12-18 | House | Vote On Passage Reconsidered |
2014-12-18 | House | Title Amended |
2014-12-18 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 717 Yeas 83 Nays 25 |
2014-12-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-16 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted And Amended |
2014-12-16 | House | Substitute H-2 Not Adopted |
2014-12-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2013-10-31 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce |
2013-10-31 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-10-31 | House | Received On 10/31/2013 |
2013-10-31 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 478 Yeas 33 Nays 4 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2013-10-30 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2013-10-30 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2013-10-30 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Michael Kowall |