MI SB0294 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-05 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on February 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-05 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Construction; other; heating requirements for a building used as a viewing area for outdoor sporting activities; exempt. Amends 1972 PA 230 (MCL 125.1501 - 125.1531) by adding sec. 13h.
Title
Construction; other; heating requirements for a building used as a viewing area for outdoor sporting activities; exempt. Amends 1972 PA 230 (MCL 125.1501 - 125.1531) by adding sec. 13h.
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Zorn [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 15 (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 161 (Y: 57 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 127 (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 161 (Y: 57 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 127 (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Vetoed By Governor 02/04/2020 |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 01/24/2020 09:27 Am |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 15 Yeas 31 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | House Substitute (h-3) Concurred In |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2019-06-19 | House | Returned To Senate |
2019-06-19 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2019-06-19 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 161 Yeas 57 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-06-19 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-06-19 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-06-19 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-06-19 | House | Substitute (h-3) Adopted |
2019-06-19 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-06-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-06-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3) |
2019-06-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2019-06-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-06-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-06-05 | House | Received On 06/05/2019 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 127 Yeas 33 Nays 4 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Dale Zorn |