MI SB0364 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-24 - Assigned Pa 0152'23 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-24 - Assigned Pa 0152'23 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax: board of review; definition of qualified error; modify. Amends sec. 53b of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.53b). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0176'23
Title
Property tax: board of review; definition of qualified error; modify. Amends sec. 53b of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.53b). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0176'23
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 327 (Y: 103 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 422 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 422 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-24 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0152'23 With Immediate Effect |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/19/2023 11:32 Am |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Approved By Governor 10/19/2023 09:46 Am |
2023-10-11 | Senate | Presented To Governor 10/10/2023 09:22 Am |
2023-10-03 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2023-10-03 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2023-10-03 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2023-09-28 | House | Returned To Senate |
2023-09-28 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2023-09-28 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 327 Yeas 103 Nays 5 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2023-09-28 | House | Read A Third Time |
2023-09-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2023-09-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-09-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-09-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-07-18 | House | Per Rule 41 Referred To Committee On Military, Veterans And Homeland Security |
2023-06-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Insurance And Financial Services |
2023-06-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-06-28 | House | Received On 06/28/2023 |
2023-06-28 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 422 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2023-06-28 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2023-06-28 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2023-06-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-06-28 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2023-06-28 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Introduced By Senator John Damoose |
Same As/Similar To
SB0176 (Same As) 2023-10-24 - Assigned Pa 0150'23 With Immediate Effect