MI SB0455 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Assigned Pa 462'18
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Assigned Pa 462'18
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local government; financing; recommendation of a treasurer to a local public entity of 1 or more financial institutions as depositories of public money; provide for. Amends secs. 1, 2, 4 & 6 of 1932 (1st Ex Sess) PA 40 (MCL 129.11 et seq.) & repeals sec. 5 of 1932 (1st Ex Sess) PA 40 (MCL 129.15) & 1909 PA 99 (MCL 129.31 - 129.40).
Title
Local government; financing; recommendation of a treasurer to a local public entity of 1 or more financial institutions as depositories of public money; provide for. Amends secs. 1, 2, 4 & 6 of 1932 (1st Ex Sess) PA 40 (MCL 129.11 et seq.) & repeals sec. 5 of 1932 (1st Ex Sess) PA 40 (MCL 129.15) & 1909 PA 99 (MCL 129.31 - 129.40).
Sponsors
Sen. Ian Conyers [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-20 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 920 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 525 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 525 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | Senate | Assigned Pa 462'18 |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/27/2018 @ 3:54 Pm |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/26/2018 @ 8:27 Pm |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/26/2018 @ 2:56 Pm |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-20 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-12-20 | House | Passed Roll Call # 920 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2018-12-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-19 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-19 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-11-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-11-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-06-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2018-06-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-06-12 | House | Received On 06/12/2018 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 525 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Ian Conyers |