MI SB0558 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0489'16 12/30/16 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0489'16 12/30/16 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Probate; other; dower rights; repeal. Amends 1846 RS 66 (MCL 558.1 - 558.29), by adding sec. 30 & repeals secs. 2931 & 2933 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.2931 & 600.2933).
Title
Probate; other; dower rights; repeal. Amends 1846 RS 66 (MCL 558.1 - 558.29), by adding sec. 30 & repeals secs. 2931 & 2933 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.2931 & 600.2933).
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 747 (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 746 (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 634 (Y: 66 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 494 (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 746 (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 634 (Y: 66 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 494 (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0489'16 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/6/2017 @ 1:22 Pm 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/5/2017 @ 11:45 Am 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2016 @ 1:24 Pm |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Roll Call # 747 Yeas 33 Nays 4 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Vote Reconsidered |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Roll Call # 746 Yeas 32 Nays 4 Excused 1 Not Voting 1 |
2016-12-13 | Senate | House Substitute H-2 Concurred In |
2016-12-13 | House | Returned To Senate |
2016-12-13 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2016-12-13 | House | Passed Roll Call # 634 Yeas 66 Nays 42 |
2016-12-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-12-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-12-07 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2016-12-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-11-29 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-11-29 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2015-11-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-11-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-11-05 | House | Received On 11/05/2015 |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 494 Yeas 34 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2015-11-04 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2015-11-04 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2015-11-04 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2015-10-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-10-13 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |