MI SB0686 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-23 - Veto Override Defeated Roll Call # 263 Yeas 22 Nays 15 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Public employees and officers; other; state agency or department disciplining an employee for communicating with a legislator; prohibit unless the communication is prohibited. Creates new act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public employees and officers; other; state agency or department disciplining an employee for communicating with a legislator; prohibit unless the communication is prohibited. Creates new act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Veto Override Defeated Roll Call # 263 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 264 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 78 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-23SenateVeto Override Defeated Roll Call # 263 Yeas 22 Nays 15 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2020-07-22SenateVetoed By Governor 07/08/2020
2020-07-22SenatePresented To Governor 06/30/2020 11:05 Am
2020-06-25SenateOrdered Enrolled
2020-06-25SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2020-06-24HouseReturned To Senate
2020-06-24HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 264 Yeas 108 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2020-06-24HouseRead A Third Time
2020-06-10HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-06-10HouseRead A Second Time
2020-06-03HouseReferred To Second Reading
2020-05-20HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2020-05-20HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means
2020-02-26HouseReferred To Committee On Oversight
2020-02-26HouseRead A First Time
2020-02-26HouseReceived On 02/26/2020
2020-02-26SenatePassed Roll Call # 78 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2020-02-26SenateSubstitute (s-3) Adopted
2020-02-19SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2020-02-19SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2020-01-22SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2020-01-22SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2020-01-22SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2019-12-10SenateReferred To Committee On Oversight
2019-12-10SenateIntroduced By Senator Tom Barrett

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-SB-0686
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2019-SIB-0686.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2019-SEBS-0686.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2019-SNB-0686.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-01-22-007.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-02-26-021.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-05-20-043.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-06-24-058.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-07-23-060.htm

Bill Comments

feedback