MI SB0690 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Referred To Committee On Military, Veterans And Homeland Security
Pending: House Military, Veterans And Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Referred To Committee On Military, Veterans And Homeland Security
Pending: House Military, Veterans And Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Military affairs: other; Michigan code of military justice; revise. Amends secs. 2, 3, 6, 10, 15, 16, 17, 18, 19, 20, 23, 24, 26, 27, 29, 32, 34, 36, 43, 48, 52, 54, 58, 61, 65, 66, 67, 121 & 147 of 1980 PA 523 (MCL 32.1002 et seq.); adds secs. 6a, 30a, 38a, 58a, 58b, 93a, 106, 106a, 112a, 120, 121a, 121b, 122, 123, 128, 131a, 131b, 131c, 132a, 134a, 134b, 134c & 134d & repeals sec. 21 of 1980 PA 523 (MCL 32.1021).
Title
Military affairs: other; Michigan code of military justice; revise. Amends secs. 2, 3, 6, 10, 15, 16, 17, 18, 19, 20, 23, 24, 26, 27, 29, 32, 34, 36, 43, 48, 52, 54, 58, 61, 65, 66, 67, 121 & 147 of 1980 PA 523 (MCL 32.1002 et seq.); adds secs. 6a, 30a, 38a, 58a, 58b, 93a, 106, 106a, 112a, 120, 121a, 121b, 122, 123, 128, 131a, 131b, 131c, 132a, 134a, 134b, 134c & 134d & repeals sec. 21 of 1980 PA 523 (MCL 32.1021).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 42 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Military, Veterans And Homeland Security |
2024-03-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2024-03-05 | House | Received On 02/29/2024 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 42 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Veterans And Emergency Services |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Veronica Klinefelt |