MI SB0915 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Assigned Pa 0273'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Assigned Pa 0273'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control; traffic regulation; maximum width of school buses; provide for, and exempt from seasonal road restrictions. Amends secs. 717 & 722 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.717 & 257.722).
Title
Traffic control; traffic regulation; maximum width of school buses; provide for, and exempt from seasonal road restrictions. Amends secs. 717 & 722 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.717 & 257.722).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 518 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 298 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 298 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-05 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0273'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/29/2018 @ 10:50 Am |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Approved By Governor 6/27/2018 @ 9:12 Pm |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Presented To Governor 6/25/2018 @ 2:20 Pm |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-06-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-06-12 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-06-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 518 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2018-06-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-06-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-06-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-06-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-06-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-05-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2018-05-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-05-16 | House | Received On 05/16/2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 298 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Thomas Casperson |