MI SB0922 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Assigned Pa 469'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Assigned Pa 469'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for using an unmanned aircraft in a manner that interferes with the operations of a key facility; provide for. Amends sec. 16b, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.16b).
Title
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for using an unmanned aircraft in a manner that interferes with the operations of a key facility; provide for. Amends sec. 16b, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.16b).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 829 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 843 (Y: 105 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 583 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 843 (Y: 105 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 583 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | Senate | Assigned Pa 469'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/27/2018 @ 4:08 Pm |
2018-12-28 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/24/2018 @ 11:25 Am |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/18/2018 @ 11:16 Am |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Roll Call # 829 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-13 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-12-13 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 843 Yeas 105 Nays 4 |
2018-12-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-12 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2018-12-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-12-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2018-09-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Communications And Technology |
2018-09-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-09-27 | House | Received On 09/27/2018 |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 583 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Darwin Booher |