MI SB1055 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-10 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-10 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Businesses: nonprofit corporations; ability of a hospital to convert from a county hospital to a non-profit hospital; allow. Amends sec. 305a of 1987 PA 230 (MCL 331.1305a).
Title
Businesses: nonprofit corporations; ability of a hospital to convert from a county hospital to a non-profit hospital; allow. Amends sec. 305a of 1987 PA 230 (MCL 331.1305a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-11-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 382 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 382 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-11-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2022-06-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2022-06-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-06-30 | House | Received On 06/30/2022 |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 382 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Wayne A. Schmidt |