MI SB1057 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-04 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-04 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources; forests; private forest management; provide oversight from the department of agriculture and rural development and provide for conservation district assistance to owners of forestland. Amends secs. 9301, 9302, 9304, 9307, 9308 & 9310 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.9301 et seq.); adds secs. 51301, 51302 & 51305 & repeals secs. 50110, 50112 & 50136 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.50110 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4302'11, HB 4969'11, HB 4970'11, SB 1058'12, SB 1059'12, SB 1061'12, SB 1062'12
Title
Natural resources; forests; private forest management; provide oversight from the department of agriculture and rural development and provide for conservation district assistance to owners of forestland. Amends secs. 9301, 9302, 9304, 9307, 9308 & 9310 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.9301 et seq.); adds secs. 51301, 51302 & 51305 & repeals secs. 50110, 50112 & 50136 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.50110 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4302'11, HB 4969'11, HB 4970'11, SB 1058'12, SB 1059'12, SB 1061'12, SB 1062'12
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 639 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 639 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-09-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Tourism, And Outdoor Recreation |
2012-09-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-09-20 | House | Received On 09/20/2012 |
2012-09-20 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 639 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-09-19 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2012-09-19 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2012-09-19 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment And Great Lakes |
Subjects
Natural resources, forests
Natural resources, soil and erosion
State agencies (existing), agriculture
State agencies (existing), natural resources and environment
Natural resources, soil and erosion
State agencies (existing), agriculture
State agencies (existing), natural resources and environment