MI SB1162 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-08 - Referred To Committee On Tax Policy
Pending: House Tax Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-08 - Referred To Committee On Tax Policy
Pending: House Tax Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Corporate income tax; other; election to file a return under the Michigan business tax under certain circumstances; provide for. Amends sec. 680 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.680). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5558'16
Title
Corporate income tax; other; election to file a return under the Michigan business tax under certain circumstances; provide for. Amends sec. 680 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.680). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5558'16
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 710 (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-11-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2016-12-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-12-08 | House | Received On 12/08/2016 |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 710 Yeas 31 Nays 6 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-11-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2016-11-10 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jack Brandenburg |
Same As/Similar To
HB5557 (Same As) 2016-04-27 - Referred To Second Reading