MI SB1171 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-08 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-08 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Law enforcement; records; fingerprinting and photographing of individual with special health care needs taken and submitted to the automated fingerprint identification system (AFIS) and the statewide network of agency photos upon request of parent or guardian; allow. Amends sec. 1 of 1935 PA 120 (MCL 28.271) & adds sec. 4.
Title
Law enforcement; records; fingerprinting and photographing of individual with special health care needs taken and submitted to the automated fingerprint identification system (AFIS) and the statewide network of agency photos upon request of parent or guardian; allow. Amends sec. 1 of 1935 PA 120 (MCL 28.271) & adds sec. 4.
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-12-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 725 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-11-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2016-12-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-12-08 | House | Received On 12/08/2016 |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 725 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-11-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2016-11-10 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |