MI SB1185 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Vetoed By Governor 12/30/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Vetoed By Governor 12/30/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Torts: liability; pandemic health care immunity act; create. Creates new act.
Title
Torts: liability; pandemic health care immunity act; create. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 610 (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 624 (Y: 58 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 418 (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 624 (Y: 58 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 418 (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-30 | Senate | Vetoed By Governor 12/30/2020 |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/21/2020 01:48 Pm |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 610 Yeas 21 Nays 16 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2020-12-18 | Senate | House Substitute (h-3) Concurred In |
2020-12-17 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-12-17 | House | Title Amended |
2020-12-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 624 Yeas 58 Nays 45 Excused 0 Not Voting 7 |
2020-12-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-12-17 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-17 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-12-17 | House | Substitute (h-3) Adopted |
2020-12-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-12-01 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-12-01 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3) |
2020-11-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2020-11-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-11-05 | House | Received On 11/05/2020 |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 418 Yeas 21 Nays 13 Excused 4 Not Voting 0 |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Curtis S. Vanderwall |