MN HF1268 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Author added Clardy
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Author added Clardy
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Teacher licensure and teacher preparation program changes made, Professional Educator Licensing Standards Board membership changes made, and money appropriated.
Title
Teacher licensure and teacher preparation program changes made, Professional Educator Licensing Standards Board membership changes made, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Josiah Hill [D] | Rep. Mary Clardy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | House | Author added Clardy |
2023-02-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Finance |
2023-02-02 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1641 (Similar To) 2023-03-07 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Education Finance