MN HF1547 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-06 - Author added Clardy
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-06 - Author added Clardy
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Compensatory revenue modified, revenue uses changed, best practices encouraged, percentage of compensatory revenue that must stay at each school site increased, report on eliminating paper forms required, and money appropriated.
Title
Compensatory revenue modified, revenue uses changed, best practices encouraged, percentage of compensatory revenue that must stay at each school site increased, report on eliminating paper forms required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Sandra Feist [D] | Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] | Rep. Sydney Jordan [D] | Rep. Dan Wolgamott [D] |
Rep. Mary Clardy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-06 | House | Author added Clardy |
2023-03-02 | House | Author added Wolgamott |
2023-02-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Education Finance |
2023-02-09 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Education Policy |
2023-02-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF2017 (Similar To) 2023-02-21 - Referred to Education Finance