MN HF1581 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Farmer mental health and farm advocate services and farmer-lender mediators money appropriated, and an appropriation canceled.
Title
Farmer mental health and farm advocate services and farmer-lender mediators money appropriated, and an appropriation canceled.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Second reading |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-03-28 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-02-25 | House | Author added Poston |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred by Chair to Agriculture and Food Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1726 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance