MN HF1658 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-23 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-23 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Higher education technical and policy provision changes made including provisions related to grants, loans, registration, and various higher education programs; institutions prohibited from limiting access to a student's transcript; various statutes modernized, streamlined, and clarified; and obsolete language and unnecessary verbiage deleted.
Title
Higher education technical and policy provision changes made including provisions related to grants, loans, registration, and various higher education programs; institutions prohibited from limiting access to a student's transcript; various statutes modernized, streamlined, and clarified; and obsolete language and unnecessary verbiage deleted.
Sponsors
Rep. Bud Nornes [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2015-04-23 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2015-04-22 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF1535 |
2015-03-26 | House | Second reading |
2015-03-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2015-03-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Higher Education Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1535 (Similar To) 2015-04-23 - Second reading