MN HF1676 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Author added Bernardy.
Pending: House Government Operations and Elections Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Author added Bernardy.
Pending: House Government Operations and Elections Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
American Indian and Indigenous Peoples Day established.
Title
American Indian and Indigenous Peoples Day established.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Allen [D] | Rep. Karen Clark [D] | Rep. Ilhan Omar [D] | Rep. Liz Olson [D] |
Rep. Linda Slocum [D] | Rep. JoAnn Ward [D] | Rep. Jason Metsa [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] |
Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] | Rep. Peggy Flanagan [D] | Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] |
Rep. David Bly [D] | Sen. Erin Murphy [D] | Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | House | Author added Bernardy. |
2017-03-07 | House | Author added Murphy, E. |
2017-02-27 | House | Authors added Moran and Bly. |
2017-02-23 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2140 (Similar To) 2017-03-15 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections