MN HF172 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
POW and MIA Recognition Day established.
Title
POW and MIA Recognition Day established.
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Grossell [R] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] |
Rep. Peggy Bennett [R] | Rep. Jeff Brand [D] | Rep. Heather Edelson [D] | Rep. Barb Haley [R] |
Rep. John Poston [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2019-05-07 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF242 |
2019-03-13 | House | Author added Poston |
2019-03-13 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-02-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations |
2019-01-24 | House | Authors added Brand, Edelson, and Haley |
2019-01-22 | House | Author added Bennett |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF242 (Similar To) 2019-05-07 - Second reading