MN HF2149 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - Secretary of State Chapter 227 04/23/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - Secretary of State Chapter 227 04/23/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Domestic violence-related offense qualifying definition expanded.
Title
Domestic violence-related offense qualifying definition expanded.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Simon [D] | Rep. Kelby Woodard [R] | Rep. Tony Cornish [R] | Rep. John Lesch [D] |
Rep. Steve Smith [R] | Sen. Ronald Latz [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - House - Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-24 | Secretary of State Chapter 227 04/23/12 | |
2012-04-23 | Governor's action Approval | |
2012-04-20 | Presented to Governor | |
2012-04-19 | House | Returned from Senate |
2012-04-19 | Senate | Consent Calendar: Third reading Passed vote: 65-0 |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Second reading |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on Consent Calendar SF1657 |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Received from House |
2012-03-28 | House | Bill was passed vote: 130-0 |
2012-03-28 | House | Third reading |
2012-03-26 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2012-03-05 | House | Second reading |
2012-03-05 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2012-02-20 | House | Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Judiciary Policy and Finance |
2012-02-16 | House | Author added Smith |
2012-02-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Crime Prevention Policy and Finance |