MN HF2167 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-13 - Authors added Hollins; Huot; Tabke; Becker-Finn
Pending: House Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-13 - Authors added Hollins; Huot; Tabke; Becker-Finn
Pending: House Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supportive arts for incarcerated persons and persons on supervised release provided, reports required, and money appropriated.
Title
Supportive arts for incarcerated persons and persons on supervised release provided, reports required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | House | Authors added Hollins; Huot; Tabke; Becker-Finn |
2023-03-08 | House | Authors added Pinto; Feist |
2023-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2469 (Similar To) 2023-03-02 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety