MN HF2194 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Author added Bahner
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Author added Bahner
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hennepin and Ramsey Counties; motor vehicle sales tax allocation allowed.
Title
Hennepin and Ramsey Counties; motor vehicle sales tax allocation allowed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Author added Bahner |
2019-03-18 | House | Author added Pryor |
2019-03-13 | House | Author added Klevorn |
2019-03-11 | House | Author added Acomb |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF2087 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - Referred to Taxes