MN HF2334 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-18 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-18 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Health care policy governing provisions modified.
Title
Health care policy governing provisions modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-03-13 | House | Author added Morrison |
2019-03-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2446 (Similar To) 2019-03-27 - Second reading