MN HF3276 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Introduced on April 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Joint rule 2.03 waived
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Joint rule 2.03 waived
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Ranked choice voting provided; jurisdictions authorized to adopt ranked choice voting for local offices; ranked choice voting for local jurisdictions adoption, implementation, and use established; local jurisdictions allowed to use electronic voting systems with a reallocation feature; and rulemaking authorized.
Title
Ranked choice voting provided; jurisdictions authorized to adopt ranked choice voting for local offices; ranked choice voting for local jurisdictions adoption, implementation, and use established; local jurisdictions allowed to use electronic voting systems with a reallocation feature; and rulemaking authorized.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2024-04-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2024-04-15 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2024-04-15 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2024-03-18 | House | Author added PĂ©rez-Vega |
2024-03-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State and Local Government Finance and Policy |
2024-03-14 | House | Author added Fischer |
2024-03-07 | House | Author added Sencer-Mura, Curran, Tabke, Freiberg and Hassan |
2024-03-04 | House | Authors added Bierman, Hollins and Agbaje |
2024-02-28 | House | Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger |
2024-02-26 | House | Authors added Wolgamott and Hornstein |
2024-02-22 | House | Authors added Berg; Hanson, J; Reyer |
2024-02-19 | House | Authors added Bahner, Xiong, Norris, Edelson, Stephenson, Kraft, Rehm, Feist, Virnig, Pinto, Her, and Elkins |
2024-02-13 | House | Author added Coulter |
2023-04-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Elections Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3868 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Author added Mohamed