MN HF3299 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Authors added Hussein; Nelson, M., and Xiong
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Authors added Hussein; Nelson, M., and Xiong
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Definition of gifted and talented students clarified.
Title
Definition of gifted and talented students clarified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Authors added Hussein; Nelson, M., and Xiong |
2024-04-09 | House | Authors added Knudsen and Franson |
2024-04-08 | House | Author added Wiener |
2024-04-02 | House | Author added Hollins |
2024-03-07 | House | Author added McDonald |
2023-05-08 | House | Author added Bennett |
2023-05-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2694 (Similar To) 2023-03-13 - Author added Howe