MN HF3466 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Opportunities to protect native prairie expanded.
Title
Opportunities to protect native prairie expanded.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - House - House: Passage (Y: 90 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | Second reading |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF3730 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF3730, now on General Orders |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Received from House |
2024-03-11 | House | Author added Lillie |
2024-03-07 | House | Bill was passed |
2024-03-07 | House | Third reading |
2024-03-07 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, March 7, 2024 |
2024-02-19 | House | Author added Hollins |
2024-02-19 | House | Second reading |
2024-02-19 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2024-02-15 | House | Author added Fischer |
2024-02-14 | House | Author added Kotyza-Witthuhn |
2024-02-13 | House | Authors added Hansen, R.; Curran; and Brand |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3730 (Similar To) 2024-03-13 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF3466, SF indefinitely postponed