MN HF3490 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Author added Gomez
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Author added Gomez
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Calcified human remains sale prohibited, and felony offense established.
Title
Calcified human remains sale prohibited, and felony offense established.
Sponsors
Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Rep. Zack Stephenson [D] | Rep. Brion Curran [D] | Rep. Sydney Jordan [D] |
Rep. Steve Elkins [D] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Author added Gomez |
2024-03-07 | House | Second reading |
2024-03-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2024-02-28 | House | Author added Elkins |
2024-02-22 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2024-02-19 | House | Author added Jordan |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3416 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Authors added Oumou Verbeten; Kunesh; Boldon