MN HF3519 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - House: Author added Bly
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - House: Author added Bly
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prairie Island; work group established to design a plan to monitor air and groundwater emissions from the Prairie Island nuclear plant, design of a monitoring network contracted to measure thermal discharges, reports required, and money appropriated.
Title
Prairie Island; work group established to design a plan to monitor air and groundwater emissions from the Prairie Island nuclear plant, design of a monitoring network contracted to measure thermal discharges, reports required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. David Bly [D] | Rep. Karen Clark [D] | Sen. Jeff Hayden [D] | Rep. Phyllis Kahn [D] |
Rep. Linda Slocum [D] | Rep. Jean Wagenius [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | House: Author added Bly | |
2010-03-18 | House: Author added Hayden | |
2010-03-17 | House: Division action, to pass as amended and return to Finance | |
2010-03-09 | House: Authors added Kahn and Slocum | |
2010-03-08 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Finance | |
2010-03-08 | House: Referred by Chair to Housing Finance and Policy and Public Health Finance Division |