MN HF3803 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Author added Rehm
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Author added Rehm
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Stipends required to be paid to student teachers, and money appropriated.
Title
Stipends required to be paid to student teachers, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Author added Rehm |
2024-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Finance |
2024-03-13 | House | Authors added Urdahl and Virnig |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3370 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Author added Maye Quade