MN HF4310 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Compensation plans ratified.
Title
Compensation plans ratified.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - House - House: Passage (Y: 74 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Second reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF4890 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF4890, now on General Orders |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Taken from table |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Laid on table |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2024-04-11 | House | Bill was passed |
2024-04-11 | House | Third reading |
2024-04-09 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 11, 2024 |
2024-04-02 | House | Second reading |
2024-04-02 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2024-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2024-02-28 | House | Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger |
2024-02-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State and Local Government Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4890 (Similar To) 2024-04-24 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF4310, SF indefinitely postponed