MN HF486 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 27 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-30 - Governor approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 27 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-30 - Governor approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Trunk highway system routes removed.
Title
Trunk highway system routes removed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-30 | Governor approval | |
2009-04-30 | Governor's action Approval | |
2009-04-27 | Presentment date | |
2009-04-27 | Presented to Governor | |
2009-04-24 | House: Returned from Senate | |
2009-04-24 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed | |
2009-04-22 | Senate: General Orders: To pass | |
2009-04-16 | Senate: Second reading | |
2009-04-16 | Senate: Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF1183 | |
2009-04-14 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2009-04-14 | Senate: Received from House | |
2009-04-14 | Senate: Referred to Rules and Administration | |
2009-04-07 | House: Bill was passed | |
2009-04-07 | House: Third reading | |
2009-03-30 | House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day | |
2009-03-12 | House: Second reading | |
2009-03-12 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended | |
2009-02-02 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation and Transit Policy and Oversight Division |